NJ S1775 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2254
Note: Carry Foward to future S2179
Note: Carry Over of previous S4007
Note: Carry Over of previous A5704
Note: Carry Foward to future S2179
Note: Carry Over of previous S4007
Note: Carry Over of previous A5704
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires Medicaid preferred drug lists to provide for coverage of buprenorphine for treatment of chronic pain.
Title
Requires Medicaid preferred drug lists to provide for coverage of buprenorphine for treatment of chronic pain.
Sponsors
Sen. Fred Madden [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-13 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1775 (Carry Over) 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S1775 (Carry Over) 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A2330 (Same As) 2020-02-03 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
S4007 (Carry Over) 2019-06-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A5704 (Carry Over) 2019-06-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
S1775 (Carry Over) 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A2330 (Same As) 2020-02-03 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
S4007 (Carry Over) 2019-06-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A5704 (Carry Over) 2019-06-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/S1775 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/S2000/1775_I1.HTM |