NJ A2131 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A5620

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on July 30 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-08-03 - Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Creates New Jersey Global War on Terrorism Medal.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creates New Jersey Global War on Terrorism Medal.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-07-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Assembly - Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-08-03SenateReceived in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
2020-07-30AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (74-0-0)
2020-02-03AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2020-01-14AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee

Same As/Similar To

A5620 (Carry Over) 2019-06-17 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
S2227 (Same As) 2020-06-25 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback