NJ A1969 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A4906
Note: Carry Over of previous S2209
Note: Carry Over of previous S2209
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on July 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-28 - Approved P.L.2022, c.66.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on July 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-28 - Approved P.L.2022, c.66.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Allows minors to serve as election workers between 5:30 a.m. and 9:00 p.m. on elections days.
Title
Allows minors to serve as election workers between 5:30 a.m. and 9:00 p.m. on elections days.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S138 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-23 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-12 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S138 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-23 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-12 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-28 | Senate | Approved P.L.2022, c.66. |
2022-06-29 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (37-0) |
2022-06-29 | Senate | Substituted for S138 (1R) |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2022-06-20 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
2022-06-16 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (73-3-1) |
2022-05-12 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2022-05-09 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
2022-01-11 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4906 (Carry Over) 2021-06-28 - Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
S2209 (Carry Over) 2020-10-08 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
S138 (Same As) 2022-06-29 - Substituted by A1969
S2209 (Carry Over) 2020-10-08 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
S138 (Same As) 2022-06-29 - Substituted by A1969