NH SB572 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-30 - Signed by the Governor on 07/26/2024; Chapter 0308; Effective 07/26/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-30 - Signed by the Governor on 07/26/2024; Chapter 0308; Effective 07/26/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to establishing a committee to study the sharing of confidential records among members of a multidisciplinary child protection team.
Title
Relative to establishing a committee to study the sharing of confidential records among members of a multidisciplinary child protection team.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-30 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 07/26/2024; Chapter 0308; Effective 07/26/2024 |
2024-07-15 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 06/13/2024 |
2024-07-11 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 06/13/2024); Senate Journal 18 |
2024-05-30 | Senate | Sen. Carson Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/30/2024; Senate Journal 16 |
2024-04-11 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-1397h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/11/2024 House Journal 11 P. 6 |
2024-04-11 | House | Amendment # 2024-1397h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/11/2024 House Journal 11 P. 5 |
2024-04-03 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-1397h (NT) 04/02/2024 (Vote 15-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 4 |
2024-04-03 | House | Executive Session: 04/02/2024 10:50 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2024-03-20 | House | Public Hearing: 04/02/2024 10:50 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2024-03-12 | House | Introduced 03/07/2024 and referred to Children and Family Law House Journal 7 P. 110 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/07/2024; Senate Journal 6 |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/07/2024; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 9A |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Hearing: 02/01/2024, Room 100, State House, 01:30 pm; Senate Calendar 5 |
2023-12-14 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2024 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 1 |