NH SB467 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-10 - Signed by the Governor on 07/03/2024; Chapter 0161; Effective 09/01/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-10 - Signed by the Governor on 07/03/2024; Chapter 0161; Effective 09/01/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing the Injury Prevention Center to issue motor vehicle decal plates.
Title
Authorizing the Injury Prevention Center to issue motor vehicle decal plates.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-10 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 07/03/2024; Chapter 0161; Effective 09/01/2024 |
2024-06-25 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 06/13/2024 House Journal 16 |
2024-06-24 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 06/13/2024); Senate Journal 18 |
2024-05-23 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/23/2024 House Journal 14 P. 41 |
2024-05-08 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass 05/07/2024 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 20 P. 14 |
2024-05-01 | House | Executive Session: 05/07/2024 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 203 |
2024-03-13 | House | Public Hearing: 03/19/2024 01:20 pm Legislative Office Building 203 |
2024-02-29 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 02/22/2024 and referred to Transportation House Journal 6 P. 139 |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-0107s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 01/18/2024; Senate Journal 2 |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2024-0107s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 01/18/2024; Senate Journal 2 |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-0107s, 01/18/2024; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 3 |
2023-12-18 | Senate | Hearing: 01/04/2024, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 49 |
2023-12-12 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2024 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 1 |