NH SB373 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/06/2016 House Journal 31 P. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/06/2016 House Journal 31 P. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the information technology infrastructure in public schools.
Title
Relative to the information technology infrastructure in public schools.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-06 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/06/2016 House Journal 31 P. 4 |
2016-03-30 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 04/06/2016 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 21 P. 7 |
2016-03-22 | House | Executive Session: 03/29/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 |
2016-03-08 | House | Public Hearing: 03/17/2016 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 |
2016-02-16 | House | Introduced 02/11/2016 and referred to Education House Journal 17 P. 50 |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0348s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/11/2016; Senate Journal 5 |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Committee Amendment 0348s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/11/2016 |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2016-0348s, 02/11/2016; Senate Calendar 5 |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Hearing: 02/02/2016, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 09:15 am; Senate Calendar 4 |
2015-12-29 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/06/2016 and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 1 |