NH SB331 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-19 - Sen. Bradley Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-19 - Sen. Bradley Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to waivers for out-of-state businesses and employees in a state of emergency.
Title
Relative to waivers for out-of-state businesses and employees in a state of emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-19 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 5 |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Committee Amendment 0567s, Not Voted On; Senate Journal 5 |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-0567s, 2/19/14; Senate Calendar 7 |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Hearing: 2/11/14, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 1:45 p.m.; Senate Calendar 6 |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Commerce |