NH SB304 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on December 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-05 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/05/2024; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-05 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/05/2024; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creating a cause of action for medical injuries resulting from the administration or prescription of gender transition surgery, cross-sex hormones, or puberty-blocking drugs and providing protections for individuals who receive medical detransitioning.
Title
Creating a cause of action for medical injuries resulting from the administration or prescription of gender transition surgery, cross-sex hormones, or puberty-blocking drugs and providing protections for individuals who receive medical detransitioning.
Sponsors
Sen. Kevin Avard [R] | Sen. Carrie Gendreau [R] | Rep. Jim Kofalt [R] | Rep. Maureen Mooney [R] |
Rep. Leah Cushman [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-05 | Senate | Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/05/2024; Senate Journal 8 |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 04/05/2024; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 13 |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Hearing: 01/16/2024, Room 100, State House, 01:45 pm; Senate Calendar 3 |
2023-12-06 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2024 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 1 |