NH SB249 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB249
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-18 - Sen. Carson Moved Nonconcur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 01/18/2018; Senate Journal 2
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-18 - Sen. Carson Moved Nonconcur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 01/18/2018; Senate Journal 2
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to procedures for determining and disclosing exculpatory evidence in a police officer's personnel file.
Title
Relative to procedures for determining and disclosing exculpatory evidence in a police officer's personnel file.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-18 | Senate | Sen. Carson Moved Nonconcur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 01/18/2018; Senate Journal 2 |
2018-01-03 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2393h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/03/2018 House Journal 1 P. 88 |
2018-01-03 | House | Amendment # 2017-2393h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 01/03/2018 House Journal 1 P. 87 |
2017-11-15 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2017-2393h (NT) for 01/03/2018 (Vote 15-2; Regular Calendar) |
2017-09-19 | House | Executive Session: 10/17/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 208 |
2017-06-19 | House | Retained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 09/07/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 208 |
2017-06-19 | House | Retained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 09/05/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 208 |
2017-06-02 | House | Retained Bill Full Committee Work Session: 06/06/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 208 |
2017-04-25 | House | Retained in Committee |
2017-04-19 | House | Executive Session: 04/25/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 208 |
2017-04-04 | House | Public Hearing: 04/18/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 208 |
2017-04-04 | House | Introduced 03/23/2017 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 11 P. 28 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/30/2017; Senate Journal 12 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/30/2017; |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Special Order SB 249 to the beginning of Thursday 03/30/2017 Calendar, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 03/29/2017; |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/29/2017; Senate Calendar 16 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Hearing: 03/21/2017, Room 100, State House, 10:30 am; Senate Calendar 15 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Introduced 03/09/2017 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 9 |
Same As/Similar To
SB249 (Carry Over) 2017-11-15 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-2393h (NT) for 01/03/2018 (Vote 15-2; Regular Calendar)