NH SB249 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB249
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-15 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-2393h (NT) for 01/03/2018 (Vote 15-2; Regular Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-15 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-2393h (NT) for 01/03/2018 (Vote 15-2; Regular Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to procedures related to the disclosure of exculpatory evidence by police officers.
Title
Relative to procedures related to the disclosure of exculpatory evidence by police officers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-15 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-2393h (NT) for 01/03/2018 (Vote 15-2; Regular Calendar) |
2017-09-19 | House | Executive Session: 10/17/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 208 |
2017-06-19 | House | Retained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 09/07/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 208 |
2017-06-19 | House | Retained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 09/05/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 208 |
2017-06-02 | House | Retained Bill Full Committee Work Session: 06/06/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 208 |
2017-04-25 | House | Retained in Committee |
2017-04-19 | House | Executive Session: 04/25/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 208 |
2017-04-04 | House | Public Hearing: 04/18/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 208 |
2017-04-04 | House | Introduced 03/23/2017 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 11 P. 28 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/30/2017; Senate Journal 12 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/30/2017; |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Special Order SB 249 to the beginning of Thursday 03/30/2017 Calendar, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 03/29/2017; |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/29/2017; Senate Calendar 16 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Hearing: 03/21/2017, Room 100, State House, 10:30 am; Senate Calendar 15 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Introduced 03/09/2017 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 9 |
Same As/Similar To
SB249 (Carry Over) 2017-11-15 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-2393h (NT) for 01/03/2018 (Vote 15-2; Regular Calendar)