NH SB22 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB22
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-03 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 01/03/2024; Senate Journal 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-03 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 01/03/2024; Senate Journal 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a study commission to study automobile insurance for newly acquired vehicles.
Title
Establishing a study commission to study automobile insurance for newly acquired vehicles.
Sponsors
Sen. Carrie Gendreau [R] | Sen. Suzanne Prentiss [D] | Sen. Timothy Lang [R] | Sen. William Gannon [R] |
Sen. David Watters [D] | Sen. Sharon Carson [R] | Sen. Rebecca Perkins Kwoka [D] | Rep. David Rochefort [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-03 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 01/03/2024; Senate Journal 1 |
2023-12-18 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 01/03/2024, Vote 4-0; Senate Calendar 49 |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/09/2023; Senate Journal 6 |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 02/09/2023; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 9 |
2023-01-06 | Senate | Hearing: 01/10/2023, Room 100, State House, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 5 |
2023-01-05 | Senate | Introduced 01/05/2023 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 4 |
Same As/Similar To
SB22 (Carry Over) 2023-02-09 - Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/09/2023; Senate Journal 6