NH SB210 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Passed on June 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-01 - Signed by the Governor on 05/27/2022; Chapter 0124; Effective 07/26/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Passed on June 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-01 - Signed by the Governor on 05/27/2022; Chapter 0124; Effective 07/26/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the sale of manufactured housing parks.
Title
Relative to the sale of manufactured housing parks.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-01 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 05/27/2022; Chapter 0124; Effective 07/26/2022 |
2022-05-24 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 05/12/2022 House Journal 13 |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 05/12/2022); Senate Journal 13 |
2022-05-04 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/04/2022 House Journal 11 |
2022-04-22 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2022-04-22 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 16-2; Regular Calendar) |
2022-04-13 | House | Executive Session: 04/20/2022 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2022-04-05 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 04/14/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2022-03-30 | House | Public Hearing: 04/07/2022 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2022-03-23 | House | Introduced 03/17/2022 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2022-1016s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/17/2022; Senate Journal 5 |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2022-1016s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/17/2022; Senate Journal 5 |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-1016s, 03/17/2022; Senate Calendar 11 |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Hearing: 02/08/2022, Room 100, State House, 09:15 am; Senate Calendar 4 |
2021-12-14 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/05/2022 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 1 |