NH SB115 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/06/2016 House Journal 4 P. 33
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/06/2016 House Journal 4 P. 33
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the resale of condominium and subdivision time shares.
Title
Relative to the resale of condominium and subdivision time shares.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-06 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/06/2016 House Journal 4 P. 33 |
2015-11-12 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Jan 6 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 67, PG. 5 |
2015-09-29 | House | Executive Session: 10/27/2015 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-09-29 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/6/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 104 |
2015-09-28 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/15/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 104 |
2015-05-12 | House | Retained in Committee |
2015-05-06 | House | Executive Session: 5/12/2015 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-04-07 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 4/28/2015 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-03-18 | House | Public Hearing: 3/24/2015 11:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-03-11 | House | Introduced and Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs; House Journal 26, PG. 1274 |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0506s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 7 |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Committee Amendment 0506s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-0506s, 3/5/15; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 11 |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Hearing: 2/5/15, Room 100, State House, 1:40 p.m.; Senate Calendar 8 |
2015-01-08 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 4 |