NH HR24 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on December 17 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-13 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Div 191-85
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 17 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-13 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Div 191-85
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging Congress to investigate the Benghazi incident.
Title
Urging Congress to investigate the Benghazi incident.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Div 191-85 |
2014-03-07 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2014-03-07 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 10-2; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 14 |
2014-02-20 | House | Executive Session: 3/04/2014 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 203 |
2014-02-05 | House | ===CANCELLED=== Executive Session: 2/13/2014 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 203 |
2014-01-28 | House | Continued Executive Session: 2/06/2014 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 203=cancelled due to weather= |
2014-01-16 | House | Executive Session: 1/23/2014 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 203=Recessed= |
2014-01-08 | House | Public Hearing: 1/16/2014 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 203 |
2013-12-17 | House | Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to State-Federal Relations and Veterans Affairs |