NH HB738 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB738
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-08 - Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-08 - Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to protection from an abusive work environment for state employees.
Title
Relative to protection from an abusive work environment for state employees.
Sponsors
Rep. Dianne Schuett [D] | Rep. Janice Schmidt [D] | Rep. Alisson Turcotte [D] | Rep. Kristina Schultz [D] |
Rep. Sallie Fellows [D] | Rep. Donna Mombourquette [D] | Rep. Arthur Ellison [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-08 | House | Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar) |
2019-10-30 | House | Executive Session: 11/06/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 307 |
2019-02-13 | House | Retained in Committee |
2019-02-11 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/12/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 201 |
2019-02-05 | House | Executive Session: 02/13/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 307 |
2019-01-29 | House | Public Hearing: 02/07/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 305-307 |
2019-01-29 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services House Journal 3 P. 28 |
2019-01-29 | House | Late Drafting and Introduction Approved by Rules Committee 01/24/2019 House Journal 3 P. 28 |
Same As/Similar To
HB738 (Carry Over) 2019-11-08 - Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar)