NH HB72 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on February 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-04 - Senate Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 15, Pg.304
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on February 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-04 - Senate Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 15, Pg.304
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a state aeronautical fund.
Title
Establishing a state aeronautical fund.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] | Rep. David Campbell [D] | Sen. Sharon Carson [R] | Rep. Chris Nevins [R] |
Rep. Lynne Ober [R] | Rep. Beverly Rodeschin [R] | Sen. Nancy Stiles [R] | Rep. Kenneth Weyler [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-04 | Senate Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 15, Pg.304 | |
2011-04-28 | Senate Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 5/4/11; Senate Calendar 22 | |
2011-04-20 | Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 1439s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-3; Senate Journal 13, Pg.268 | |
2011-04-20 | Senate Committee Amendment 1439s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 13, Pg.268 | |
2011-04-14 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2011-1439s, 4/20/11; Senate Calendar 20 | |
2011-03-24 | Senate Hearing: 3/31/11, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 9:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 17 | |
2011-03-16 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 10, Pg.169 | |
2011-02-23 | House Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 21, PG.465 | |
2011-02-16 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Feb 23 (Vote 18-1; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 15, PG.274 | |
2011-02-15 | House Executive Session: 2/16/2011 Legislative Office Building 202 Following House Session | |
2011-01-26 | House Public Hearing: 2/3/2011 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 | |
2010-12-30 | House Introduced 1/5/2011 and Referred to Ways and Means; House Journal 8, PG.129 |