NH HB589 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-09 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2023 House Journal 8 P. 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-09 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2023 House Journal 8 P. 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting state and local law enforcement from participating in the enforcement of copyright claims against free and open source software projects.
Title
Prohibiting state and local law enforcement from participating in the enforcement of copyright claims against free and open source software projects.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-09 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2023 House Journal 8 P. 5 |
2023-03-01 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate HB 589-FN 02/24/2023 (Vote 19-1; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 4 |
2023-02-07 | House | Executive Session: 02/24/2023 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2023-01-31 | House | Public Hearing: 02/09/2023 03:00 pm Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2023-01-12 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 3 P. 22 |