NH HB471 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB471
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-01 - Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-01 - Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to induced termination of pregnancy statistics.
Title
Relative to induced termination of pregnancy statistics.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-01 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2017-11-01 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-2444h for 01/03/2018 (Vote 12-8; Regular Calendar) |
2017-10-11 | House | Executive Session: 10/26/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205 |
2017-09-18 | House | Retained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 10/04/2017 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 205 |
2017-09-05 | House | Retained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 09/13/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 205 |
2017-08-15 | House | Retained Bill Full Committee Work Session: 08/30/2017 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 205 |
2017-02-24 | House | Retained in Committee |
2017-02-24 | House | Executive Session: 02/23/2017 Legislative Office Building 205 |
2017-02-22 | House | ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 02/28/2017 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 205 |
2017-02-01 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 02/07/2017 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 205 |
2017-01-25 | House | ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 02/01/2017 01:15 PM Legislative Office Building 205 |
2017-01-12 | House | Introduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 3 P. 14 |
Same As/Similar To
HB471 (Carry Over) 2017-11-01 - Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate