NH HB447 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB447
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-16 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 05/16/2024; Senate Journal 13
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-16 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 05/16/2024; Senate Journal 13
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the purchase of election equipment.
Title
Relative to the purchase of election equipment.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-16 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 05/16/2024; Senate Journal 13 |
2024-05-16 | Senate | Special Order to 05/16/2024, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 05/15/2024 Senate Journal 12 |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 05/16/2024, Vote 3-2; Senate Calendar 19 |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Hearing: 04/02/2024, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 13 |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Introduced 02/15/2024 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 5 |
2024-01-04 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-2366h: Motion Adopted DV 311-62 01/03/2024 House Journal 1 P. 123 |
2024-01-04 | House | Amendment # 2023-2366h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 01/03/2024 House Journal 1 P. 123 |
2023-11-14 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-2366h 10/31/2023 (Vote 19-1; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 49 P. 33 |
2023-10-17 | House | Executive Session: 10/31/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306-308 House Calendar 42 |
2023-03-08 | House | Retained in Committee |
2023-03-02 | House | Executive Session: 03/07/2023 03:00 pm Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2023-02-21 | House | Public Hearing: 02/28/2023 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2023-01-11 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Election Law House Journal 3 P. 16 |
Same As/Similar To
HB447 (Carry Over) 2023-03-08 - Retained in Committee