NH HB391 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-24 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/19/2023; Chapter 44; Eff: 07/18/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-24 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/19/2023; Chapter 44; Eff: 07/18/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the memorandum of understanding on data sharing between the department of health and human services and the department of environmental services.
Title
Relative to the memorandum of understanding on data sharing between the department of health and human services and the department of environmental services.
Sponsors
Rep. Nancy Murphy [D] | Rep. Wendy Thomas [D] | Rep. Rosemarie Rung [D] | Rep. Michael Edgar [D] |
Sen. Debra Altschiller [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-24 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 05/19/2023; Chapter 44; Eff: 07/18/2023 |
2023-05-17 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 05/04/2023 |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 05/11/2023); Senate Journal 15 |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/13/2023; Senate Journal 13 |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/13/2023; Senate Calendar 17 |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Hearing: 03/15/2023, Room 103, State House, 10:30 am; Senate Calendar 13 |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Introduced 02/22/2023 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 9 |
2023-02-14 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-0152h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/14/2023 House Journal 5 |
2023-02-14 | House | Amendment # 2023-0152h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/14/2023 House Journal 5 |
2023-02-09 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-0152 (NT) 02/08/2023 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 11 P. 7 |
2023-02-02 | House | Executive Session: 02/08/2023 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2023-01-24 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 01/26/2023 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2023-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 01/18/2023 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2023-01-09 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 3 P. 14 |