NH HB323 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB323
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/05/2022 House Journal 1
Status: Introduced on January 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/05/2022 House Journal 1
Summary
Relative to a statewide student assessment report.
Title
Relative to a statewide student assessment report.
Sponsors
Rep. Roderick Ladd [R] | Rep. Glenn Cordelli [R] | Rep. Alicia Lekas [R] | Rep. Ralph Boehm [R] |
Rep. Jason Osborne [R] | Rep. Kenneth Weyler [R] | Rep. Karen Umberger [R] | Rep. Steven Smith [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/05/2022 House Journal 1 |
2021-11-15 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate HB323 10/14/2021 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 48 P. 7 |
2021-09-29 | House | Executive Session: 10/14/2021 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2021-03-11 | House | Retained in Committee |
2021-03-11 | House | Executive Session: 03/11/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/95090800832 |
2021-02-17 | House | ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 02/17/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/92930919261 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-02-03 | House | ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 02/09/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/98073405784 |
2021-01-20 | House | Public Hearing: 01/26/2021 02:15 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/91325381640 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-09 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Education House Journal 2 P. 43 |
Same As/Similar To
HB323 (Carry Over) 2021-09-29 - Executive Session: 10/14/2021 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=505&sy=2022&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2022&txtbillnumber=HB323 |