AL HB19 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-07 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-07 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Jackson County, municipalities, mayors, participation in Employees' Retirement System
Title
Jackson County, municipalities, mayors, participation in Employees' Retirement System
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-02 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Roll Call 990 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-05-02 - Senate - Third Reading in Second House (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - House - LocalCertificationResolutionAdopted (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 40 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Roll Call 717 (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 32 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - House - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 36 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-02 - Senate - Third Reading in Second House (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - House - LocalCertificationResolutionAdopted (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 40 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Roll Call 717 (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 32 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - House - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 36 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-07 | House | Enacted |
2024-05-07 | House | Enacted |
2024-05-07 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2024-05-07 | House | Sent to Secretary of State |
2024-05-07 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2024-05-02 | House | Enrolled |
2024-05-02 | House | Ready to Enroll |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 990 |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Third Reading in Second House |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee Second House |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Pending Senate Local Legislation |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Local Legislation |
2024-04-23 | House | LocalCertificationResolutionAdopted |
2024-04-23 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 717 |
2024-04-23 | House | Third Reading in House of Origin |
2024-04-18 | House | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-04-18 | House | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin |
2024-02-06 | House | Pending House Local Legislation |
2024-02-06 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Local Legislation |
2023-12-01 | House | Prefiled |