LA SB349 | 2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for mental health evaluations of high school student athletes who are injured while participating in a sporting event. (gov sig) (EG SEE FISC NOTE LF EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for mental health evaluations of high school student athletes who are injured while participating in a sporting event. (gov sig) (EG SEE FISC NOTE LF EX See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-04-15 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 349 FINAL PASSAGE (#287) (Y: 31 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-16HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2024-04-15SenateRead by title, passed by a vote of 31 yeas and 8 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2024-04-09SenateRead by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2024-04-08SenateReported with amendments.
2024-03-11SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Education.
2024-03-01SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Education.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback