NH HB323 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB323
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-09-29 - Executive Session: 10/14/2021 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-09-29 - Executive Session: 10/14/2021 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to a statewide student assessment report.
Title
Relative to a statewide student assessment report.
Sponsors
Rep. Roderick Ladd [R] | Rep. Glenn Cordelli [R] | Rep. Alicia Lekas [R] | Rep. Ralph Boehm [R] |
Rep. Jason Osborne [R] | Rep. Kenneth Weyler [R] | Rep. Karen Umberger [R] | Rep. Steven Smith [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-29 | House | Executive Session: 10/14/2021 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2021-03-11 | House | Retained in Committee |
2021-03-11 | House | Executive Session: 03/11/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/95090800832 |
2021-02-17 | House | ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 02/17/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/92930919261 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-02-03 | House | ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 02/09/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/98073405784 |
2021-01-20 | House | Public Hearing: 01/26/2021 02:15 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/91325381640 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-09 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Education House Journal 2 P. 43 |
Same As/Similar To
HB323 (Carry Over) 2021-09-29 - Executive Session: 10/14/2021 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207