NH HB286 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-24 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/19/2023; Chapter 41; Eff: 07/18/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-24 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/19/2023; Chapter 41; Eff: 07/18/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the removal of political advertising.
Title
Relative to the removal of political advertising.
Sponsors
Rep. Gerri Cannon [D] | Rep. Jess Edwards [R] | Rep. Lucius Parshall [D] | Rep. Cassandra Levesque [D] |
Rep. Sallie Fellows [D] | Rep. Amanda Bouldin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-24 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 05/19/2023; Chapter 41; Eff: 07/18/2023 |
2023-05-17 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 05/04/2023 |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 05/11/2023); Senate Journal 15 |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/13/2023; Senate Journal 13 |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/13/2023; Senate Calendar 17 |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Hearing: 03/28/2023, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 09:35 am; Senate Calendar 15 |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Introduced 03/16/2023 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 11 |
2023-03-16 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/16/2023 House Journal 9 P. 4 |
2023-03-08 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass 02/28/2023 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 4 |
2023-02-21 | House | Executive Session: 02/28/2023 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2023-02-01 | House | Public Hearing: 02/07/2023 03:00 pm Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2023-01-09 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Election Law House Journal 3 P. 9 |