NH HB257 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB257
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-03 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 01/03/2024; Senate Journal 1
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-03 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 01/03/2024; Senate Journal 1
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to telephone carrier of last resort obligations.
Title
Relative to telephone carrier of last resort obligations.
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Vose [R] | Rep. Douglas Thomas [R] | Sen. William Gannon [R] | Sen. Timothy Lang [R] |
Sen. Howard Pearl [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-03 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 01/03/2024; Senate Journal 1 |
2023-12-18 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; 01/03/2024; Senate Calendar 49 |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/18/2023; Senate Journal 15 |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 05/18/2023; Senate Calendar 22A |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Hearing: 04/11/2023, Room 103, State House, 09:15 am; Senate Calendar 17 |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Introduced 03/23/2023 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 12 |
2023-03-22 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-0924h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/22/2023 House Journal 10 P. 24 |
2023-03-22 | House | Amendment # 2023-0924h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/22/2023 House Journal 10 P. 25 |
2023-03-14 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-0924h 03/13/2023 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 13 |
2023-02-27 | House | Executive Session: 03/13/2023 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2023-02-21 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 03/02/2023 10:00 am 302-304 |
2023-02-09 | House | Executive Session: 02/16/2023 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2023-02-01 | House | Public Hearing: 02/06/2023 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2023-02-01 | House | ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 02/06/2023 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2023-01-09 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy House Journal 2 P. 8 |
Same As/Similar To
HB257 (Carry Over) 2023-05-18 - Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/18/2023; Senate Journal 15