NH HB234 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB234
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/05/2022 House Journal 1
Status: Introduced on January 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/05/2022 House Journal 1
Summary
Relative to freedom of speech and association on college campuses.
Title
Relative to freedom of speech and association on college campuses.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Alexander [R] | Rep. Tim Baxter [R] | Rep. Bob Lynn [R] | Rep. William Marsh [D] |
Rep. Ross Berry [R] | Rep. Travis O'Hara [R] | Rep. Brodie Deshaies [R] | Sen. Gary Daniels [R] |
Sen. Kevin Avard [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | House | Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/05/2022 House Journal 1 |
2021-11-15 | House | Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study HB234 10/14/2021 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 48 P. 7 |
2021-09-29 | House | Executive Session: 10/14/2021 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2021-09-08 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 09/22/2021 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2021-08-16 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 09/01/2021 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 207 |
2021-03-11 | House | Retained in Committee |
2021-02-23 | House | Public Hearing: 02/23/2021 02:45 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/94382337363 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-09 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Education House Journal 2 P. 40 |
Same As/Similar To
HB234 (Carry Over) 2021-09-29 - Executive Session: 10/14/2021 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=179&sy=2022&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2022&txtbillnumber=HB234 |