NH HB234 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-23 - Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote;
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-23 - Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote;
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to occupational and professional boards and commissions procedures concerning military service and occupational experience or training.
Title
Relative to occupational and professional boards and commissions procedures concerning military service and occupational experience or training.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-23 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 5/23/13; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 21 |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Hearing: 5/1/13, Room 100, State House, 9:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 17 |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Executive Dept. & Admin; Senate Journal 8 |
2013-03-13 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #0633h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.755-756 |
2013-03-13 | House | Amendment #0633h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.755-756 |
2013-03-06 | House | Proposed Committee Amendment #2013-0633h; House Calendar 22, PG.539-540 |
2013-03-06 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0633h for Mar 13 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 22, PG.505 |
2013-02-27 | House | Continued Executive Session: 3/5/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306 |
2013-02-20 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 2/28/2013 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 |
2013-02-13 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 2/19/2013 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 |
2013-02-06 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 2/12/2013 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 |
2013-01-23 | House | Executive Session: 1/29/2013 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 306==RECESSED== |
2013-01-16 | House | Public Hearing: 1/23/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306 |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; House Journal 12, PG.188 |