NH HB173 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB173
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-03 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 01/03/2018; Senate Journal 1
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-03 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 01/03/2018; Senate Journal 1
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to regulations restricting the use of water for outdoor usage.
Title
Relative to regulations restricting the use of water for outdoor usage.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 01/03/2018; Senate Journal 1 |
2017-10-20 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; 01/03/2018; Senate Calendar 48 |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Moved to Remove HB 173 from the Consent Calendar; 04/27/2017; Senate Journal 15 |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Sen. Gray Moved to Rerefer, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/27/2017; Senate Journal 15 |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2017-1460s, 04/27/2017; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 20 |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Hearing: 04/12/2017, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 09:15 am; Senate Calendar 18 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Introduced 03/23/2017 and Referred to Public and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 11 |
2017-03-23 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0725h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 249-100 03/23/2017 House Journal 11 P. 21 |
2017-03-23 | House | FLAM # 2017-0972h (Rep. Hoell): Amendment Failed Regular Calendar 132-216 03/23/2017 House Journal 11 P. 19 |
2017-03-23 | House | Amendment # 2017-0725h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/23/2017 House Journal 11 P. 19 |
2017-03-23 | House | Removed from Consent (Rep. Hoell) 03/23/2017 House Journal 11 P. 2 |
2017-03-09 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2017-0725h for 03/23/2017 (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 3 |
2017-02-21 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 03/09/2017 12:00 PM Legislative Office Building 301 |
2017-02-15 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 02/21/2017 02:00 PM Legislative Office Building 301 |
2017-02-15 | House | Public Hearing: 02/21/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 301 |
2017-02-15 | House | Referred to Municipal and County Government 02/09/2017 House Journal 6 P. 6 |
2017-02-09 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0117h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/09/2017 House Journal 6 P. 6 |
2017-02-09 | House | Amendment # 2017-0117h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/09/2017 House Journal 6 P. 6 |
2017-01-30 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2017-0117h for 02/09/2017 (Vote 15-3; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 7 |
2017-01-27 | House | Executive Session: 01/25/2017 Legislative Office Building 305 |
2017-01-18 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 01/24/2017 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 104 |
2017-01-04 | House | Public Hearing: 01/11/2017 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 305 |
2016-12-28 | House | Introduced 01/04/2017 and referred to Resources, Recreation and Development House Journal 2 P. 19 |
Same As/Similar To
HB173 (Carry Over) 2017-10-20 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar