NH HB1625 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - Reconsider (Rep. Eaton): Motion Failed Regular Calendar 134-167 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 171
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to banning abortion after viability.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to banning abortion after viability.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-09 - House - Reconsider (Y: 134 N: 167 NV: 72 Abs: 24) [FAIL]
2016-03-09 - House - OTPA (Y: 148 N: 151 NV: 74 Abs: 24) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-10HouseReconsider (Rep. Eaton): Motion Failed Regular Calendar 134-167 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 171
2016-03-10HouseInexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 165-135 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 171
2016-03-10HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 0869h: Motion Failed Regular Calendar 148-151 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 169
2016-03-10HouseAmendment #2016-0869h: Amendment Adopted DV 156-155 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 168
2016-03-03HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate House Calendar 14 P. 61
2016-03-03HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2016-0869h for 03/09/2016 (Vote 9-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 61
2016-03-02House==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 03/02/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208
2016-03-02House==RECESSED== Executive Session: 03/01/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208
2016-02-10HousePublic Hearing: 02/16/2016 03:00 PM Legislative Office Building 208
2016-02-11HouseIntroduced 01/06/2016 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 4 P. 21

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback