NH HB1605 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-12 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/08/2018; Chapter 193; Eff. 8/7/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-12 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/08/2018; Chapter 193; Eff. 8/7/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to reinsurance.
Title
Relative to reinsurance.
Sponsors
Rep. John Hunt [R] | Rep. Edward Butler [D] | Sen. Donna Soucy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-12 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 06/08/2018; Chapter 193; Eff. 8/7/2018 |
2018-05-23 | House | Enrolled 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/10/2018); Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-15 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-1955e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-1955e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 05/10/2018); Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/02/2018; Senate Calendar 19 |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Hearing: 04/17/2018, Room 100, State House, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 16 |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Introduced 03/08/2018 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 7 |
2018-03-06 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 12 |
2018-02-28 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/06/2018 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 8 |
2018-02-26 | House | Executive Session: 02/20/2018 Legislative Office Building 302 |
2018-02-14 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/21/2018 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2018-02-14 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/20/2018 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2018-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 01/18/2018 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2017-11-13 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 1 P. 17 |