NH HB1588 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-19 - Full Committee Work Session: 09/02/2020 02:00 pm Members of the public may attend using this link: : https://www.zoom.us/j/98387930737 - Executive Session to Follow
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-19 - Full Committee Work Session: 09/02/2020 02:00 pm Members of the public may attend using this link: : https://www.zoom.us/j/98387930737 - Executive Session to Follow
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a mortgage mediation procedure.
Title
Establishing a mortgage mediation procedure.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-19 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 09/02/2020 02:00 pm Members of the public may attend using this link: : https://www.zoom.us/j/98387930737 - Executive Session to Follow |
2020-03-11 | House | Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 139 |
2020-03-05 | House | Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study for 03/11/2020 (Vote 19-0; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 40 |
2020-02-20 | House | Executive Session: 03/03/2020 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2020-02-13 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/24/2020 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2020-01-29 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/07/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2020-01-10 | House | Public Hearing: 01/16/2020 01:45 pm Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-12-04 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 1 P. 27 |