NH HB1585 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 6 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-08-06 - Signed by Governor Sununu 08/02/2024; Chapter 344; eff. I. Sec 1-6 eff 10/1/24 II. Rem eff 8/2/24 House Journal 16
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 6 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-08-06 - Signed by Governor Sununu 08/02/2024; Chapter 344; eff. I. Sec 1-6 eff 10/1/24 II. Rem eff 8/2/24 House Journal 16
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the position of certified assisted living medication aide and relative to the state loan repayment program for qualified nursing professionals, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Relative to the position of certified assisted living medication aide and relative to the state loan repayment program for qualified nursing professionals, and making an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
Rep. Jaci Grote [D] | Rep. Joe Schapiro [D] | Rep. Lucy Weber [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-08-06 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 08/02/2024; Chapter 344; eff. I. Sec 1-6 eff 10/1/24 II. Rem eff 8/2/24 House Journal 16 |
2024-07-23 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2024-2360e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote (in recess of) 06/13/2024 House Journal 16 |
2024-07-23 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 06/13/2024 House Journal 16 |
2024-07-18 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 06/13/2024); Senate Journal 18 |
2024-07-12 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2024-2360e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 06/13/2024); Senate Journal 18 |
2024-06-13 | House | Conference Committee Report 2024-2227c: Adopted, Voice Vote 06/13/2024 House Journal 16 |
2024-06-12 | Senate | Conference Committee Report # 2024-2227c, Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/13/2024; Senate Journal 17 |
2024-06-06 | Senate | Conference Committee Report Filed, # 2024-2227c; 06/13/2024 |
2024-06-04 | House | Conferee Change: Rep. Osborne Replaces Rep. Nagel 06/04/2024 House Journal 15 P. 35 |
2024-06-04 | House | Conference Committee Meeting: 06/04/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 201 |
2024-05-30 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Pearl, Carson, Perkins Kwoka; 05/30/2024; Senate Journal 16 |
2024-05-30 | Senate | Sen. Pearl Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/30/2024; Senate Journal 16 |
2024-05-29 | House | House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment 2024-2005s 2024-2181s and 2024-2185s and Requests CofC (Reps. W. MacDonald, Nagel, Merchant, Weber): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/29/2024 House Journal 14 P. 180 |
2024-05-24 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendments 2024-2005s, 2024-2181s, and 2024-2185s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/23/2024; Senate Journal 15 |
2024-05-24 | Senate | Sen. Perkins Kwoka Floor Amendment # 2024-2185s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/23/2024; Senate Journal 15 |
2024-05-24 | Senate | Sen. Carson Withdraws Floor Amendment # 2024-2129s; 05/23/2024; Senate Journal 15 |
2024-05-24 | Senate | Sen. Carson Moved to Reconsider 1. Rescind Third Reading 2. Reconsider Ought to Pass with Amendment 3. Reconsider Floor Amendment 2024-2185s 4. Reconsider 2024-2129s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/23/2024; Senate Journal 15 |
2024-05-23 | Senate | Without Objection, the Clerk is authorized to make technical and administrative corrections which are necessary to reflect the intent of the Senate, Motion Adopted; 05/23/2024; Senate Journal 15 |
2024-05-23 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendments 2024-2017s, 2024-2127S, 2024-2129s, and 2024-2185s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/23/2024; Senate Journal 15 |
2024-05-23 | Senate | Sen. Perkins Kwoka Floor Amendment # 2024-2185s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/23/2024; Senate Journal 15 |
2024-05-23 | Senate | Sen. Carson Floor Amendment # 2024-2129s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/23/2024; Senate Journal 15 |
2024-05-23 | Senate | Sen. Gannon Floor Amendment # 2024-2181s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/23/2024; Senate Journal 15 |
2024-05-23 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2024-2005s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/23/2024; Senate Journal 15 |
2024-05-22 | Senate | Special Order to the end of the calendar on 05/23/2024, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 05/22/2024; Senate Journal 14 |
2024-05-22 | Senate | Sen. Carson Moved to Remove HB 1585 from the Consent Calendar; 05/22/2024; Senate Journal 14 |
2024-05-16 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-2005s, 05/22/2024; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 20 |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Hearing: 04/17/2024, Room 103, State House, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 14 |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Introduced 03/21/2024 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 8 |
2024-03-28 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-1246h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/28/2024 House Journal 10 P. 91 |
2024-03-28 | House | Amendment # 2024-1246h (NT): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/28/2024 House Journal 10 P. 91 |
2024-03-20 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-1246h 03/20/2024 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 12 P. 17 |
2024-03-07 | House | Executive Session: 03/20/2024 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 203 |
2024-03-07 | House | Public Hearing on non-germane Amendment # 2024-0908h: 03/20/2024 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 203 |
2024-02-28 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 03/06/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 203 |
2024-02-07 | House | Executive Session: 02/14/2024 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2024-01-25 | House | Public Hearing: 01/31/2024 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2023-12-15 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 1 P. 25 |