NH HB142 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-25 - Signed By Governor 07/24/2013; Effective 09/22/2013; Chapter 0243
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to teacher evaluation systems.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to teacher evaluation systems.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-07-25HouseSigned By Governor 07/24/2013; Effective 09/22/2013; Chapter 0243
2013-06-26HouseEnrolled; House Journal 52, PG.1714
2013-06-26SenateEnrolled
2013-06-26HouseConference Committee Report #2032c Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 52, PG.1690
2013-06-26SenateConference Committee Report 2032c; Adopted, Voice Vote
2013-06-18SenateConference Committee Report #2013-2032c; Senate Amendment + New Amendment, Filed
2013-06-05HouseConferee Change: Rep Gile Replaces Rep Myler; House Journal 49, PG.1648
2013-06-05HouseCommittee of Conference Meeting: 6/11/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 ==ROOM CHANGE==
2013-05-30SenatePresident Appoints: Senators Stiles, Reagan, and Kelly
2013-05-30SenateSen. Stiles Moved Accede to House Request for Committee of Conference, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote
2013-05-22HouseSpeaker Appoints: Reps Grassie, Myler, Gorman, and Ladd; House Journal 43, PG.1465
2013-05-22HouseHouse Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment #1518s and Requests C of C (Rep Gile): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 43, PG.1465
2013-05-02SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 1518s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg
2013-05-02SenateSen. Stiles Floor Amendment #2013-1518s, Regular Calendar 13Y-11N, Amendment Adopted;
2013-05-02SenateSen. Kelly Floor Amendment #2013-1488s, Div. 12Y-12N, Amendment Failed;
2013-05-02SenateCommittee Amendment 1343s, Amendment Failed, Voice Vote;
2013-04-24SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-1343s, 5/2/13; Senate Calendar 18
2013-03-20SenateHearing: 3/26/13, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 9:40 a.m.; Senate Calendar 13
2013-03-07SenateIntroduced and Referred to Health, Education & Human Services; Senate Journal 7
2013-03-06HouseOught to Pass with Amendment #0462h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 24, PG.651
2013-03-06HouseAmendment #0462h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 24, PG.651
2013-02-19HouseProposed Committee Amendment #2013-0462h; House Calendar 20, PG.442
2013-02-19HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0462h for Mar 6 (Vote 17-1; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 20, PG.407
2013-02-13HouseExecutive Session: 2/19/2013 1:45 PM Legislative Office Building 207
2013-02-12HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 2/19/2013 12:15 PM Legislative Office Building 207
2013-01-09HousePublic Hearing: 1/15/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207
2013-01-03HouseIntroduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Education; House Journal 12, PG.184

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback