NH HB1403 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on December 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-16 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/16/2022 House Journal 3
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-16 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/16/2022 House Journal 3
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a commission relative to the minimum wage.
Title
Establishing a commission relative to the minimum wage.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-16 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/16/2022 House Journal 3 |
2022-02-10 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 21-0; Consent Calendar) |
2022-02-10 | House | Executive Session: 02/03/2022 03:15 pm Legislative Office Building305-307 |
2022-02-03 | House | Public Hearing: 02/03/2022 3:15 p.m. Legislative Office Building305-307 |
2021-12-01 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services |