NH HB1371 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proclaiming March 2 Reading in New Hampshire Day.
Title
Proclaiming March 2 Reading in New Hampshire Day.
Sponsors
Rep. Joshua Adjutant [D] | Rep. Denny Ruprecht [D] | Rep. Timothy Josephson [D] | Rep. Robert Cushing [D] |
Rep. Rosemarie Rung [D] | Rep. Jerry Stringham [D] | Rep. Catherine Sofikitis [D] | Rep. Bruce Cohen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-16 | Senate | Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | ==CANCELLED== Hearing: 03/17/2020, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 10:15 am; Senate Calendar 11 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Introduced 03/11/2020 and Referred to Education and Workforce Development; Senate Journal 7 |
2020-02-19 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/19/2020 House Journal 4 P. 9 |
2020-02-05 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 02/19/2020 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 7 P. 5 |
2020-01-22 | House | Executive Session: 01/30/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 207 |
2020-01-10 | House | Public Hearing: 01/16/2020 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 207 |
2019-12-02 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Education House Journal 1 P. 19 |