NH HB1351 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-03 - House Signed By Governor 05/02/2012; Effective 07/01/2012; Chapter 0033
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-03 - House Signed By Governor 05/02/2012; Effective 07/01/2012; Chapter 0033
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to disclosure of information by the board of funeral directors and embalmers and governing boards of allied health professionals.
Title
Relative to disclosure of information by the board of funeral directors and embalmers and governing boards of allied health professionals.
Sponsors
Rep. Neal Kurk [R] | Rep. Carol McGuire [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-03 | House Signed By Governor 05/02/2012; Effective 07/01/2012; Chapter 0033 | |
2012-04-18 | Senate Enrolled; Senate Journal 11, Pg.383 | |
2012-04-11 | House Enrolled | |
2012-04-11 | Senate Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 9, Pg.349 | |
2012-04-03 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 4/11/12; Senate Calendar 14 | |
2012-03-22 | Senate Hearing: 3/29/12, Room 100, State House, 9:25 a.m.; Senate Calendar 12 | |
2012-03-07 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 7, Pg.186 | |
2012-02-22 | House Ought to Pass with Amendment #0716h(NT): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 20, PG.1203 | |
2012-02-22 | House Amendment #0716h(NT) Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 20, PG.1203 | |
2012-02-13 | House Proposed Committee Amendment #2012-0716h (New Title); House Calendar 14, PG.836 | |
2012-02-13 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0716h(NT) for Feb 22 (Vote 9-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 14, PG.801 | |
2012-02-08 | House Executive Session: 2/13/2012 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306 | |
2012-02-08 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 2/10/2012 12:45 PM Legislative Office Building 305 | |
2012-02-08 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 2/9/2012 3:15 PM Legislative Office Building 308 | |
2012-01-30 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 2/2/2012 3:45 PM Legislative Office Building 306 | |
2012-01-24 | House ==CANCELLED== Subcommittee Work Session: 1/26/2012 12:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306 | |
2012-01-24 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 1/25/2012 3:25 PM Legislative Office Building 306 | |
2012-01-10 | House Public Hearing: 1/19/2012 11:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 | |
2011-11-21 | House Introduced 1/4/2012 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; House Journal 7, PG.352 |