NH HB1190 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-28 - Signed by the Governor on 5/27/2014; Chapter 0051; Effective 7/26/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-28 - Signed by the Governor on 5/27/2014; Chapter 0051; Effective 7/26/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to approval of budget transfers in Hillsborough county.
Title
Relative to approval of budget transfers in Hillsborough county.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-28 | House | Signed by the Governor on 5/27/2014; Chapter 0051; Effective 7/26/2014 |
2014-05-01 | House | Enrolled (In recess of 4/30/14) |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 9 |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 4/17/14; Senate Calendar 14 |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Hearing: 3/26/14, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 10:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 11 |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Public and Municipal Affairs |
2014-03-12 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #0754h Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-03-12 | House | Floor Amendment #2014-0754h (Rep. Williams) Amendment Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-03-05 | House | Removed from Consent (Rep. Williams) |
2014-02-07 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 14 |
2014-01-28 | House | Executive Session: 2/04/2014 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 301 |
2014-01-21 | House | Public Hearing: 1/28/2014 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 301 |
2013-12-13 | House | Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Municipal and County Government |