NH HB1175 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-23 - Signed by Governor Hassan 05/19/2016; Chapter 80; Eff. 1/1/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-23 - Signed by Governor Hassan 05/19/2016; Chapter 80; Eff. 1/1/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to post-judgment real estate liens.
Title
Relative to post-judgment real estate liens.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-23 | House | Signed by Governor Hassan 05/19/2016; Chapter 80; Eff. 1/1/2017 |
2016-05-12 | House | Enrolled 05/11/2016 House Journal 38 P. 46 |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/05/2016); Senate Journal 17 |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/21/2016; Senate Journal 14 |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/21/2016; Senate Calendar 15 |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Hearing: 03/31/2016, Room 100, State House, 02:00 pm; Senate Calendar 12 |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Introduced 03/17/2016 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 10 |
2016-03-10 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0371h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 148 |
2016-03-10 | House | Amendment #2016-0371h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 147 |
2016-02-25 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2016-0371h for 03/09/2016 (Vote 14-2; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 57 |
2016-02-25 | House | Executive Session: 02/18/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 |
2016-01-20 | House | Public Hearing: 01/28/2016 03:00 PM Legislative Office Building 208 |
2016-02-10 | House | Introduced 01/06/2016 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 4 P. 4 |