NH HB1095 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 7 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-08-07 - Signed by Governor Sununu 08/02/2024; Chapter 327; Eff. 07/01/2024 House Journal 16
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 7 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-08-07 - Signed by Governor Sununu 08/02/2024; Chapter 327; Eff. 07/01/2024 House Journal 16
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the administration of occupational boards by the office of professional licensure and certification.
Title
Relative to the administration of occupational boards by the office of professional licensure and certification.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-08-07 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 08/02/2024; Chapter 327; Eff. 07/01/2024 House Journal 16 |
2024-07-23 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2024-2340e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote (in recess of) 06/13/2024 House Journal 16 |
2024-07-23 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 06/13/2024 House Journal 16 |
2024-07-18 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 06/13/2024); Senate Journal 18 |
2024-07-10 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2024-2340e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 06/13/2024); Senate Journal 18 |
2024-05-30 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment 2024-1738s (Rep. C. McGuire): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/30/2024 House Journal 15 P. 15 |
2024-05-09 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-1738s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/15/2024; Senate Journal 12 |
2024-05-09 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2024-1738s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/15/2024; Senate Journal 12 |
2024-05-07 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2024-1738s, 05/16/2024; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 19 |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Hearing: 04/10/2024, Room 103, State House, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 14 |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Introduced 03/21/2024 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 8 |
2024-03-28 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-1212h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/28/2024 House Journal 10 P. 31 |
2024-03-28 | House | Amendment # 2024-1212h (NT): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/28/2024 House Journal 10 P. 31 |
2024-03-20 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-1212h (NT) 03/20/2024 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 12 P. 14 |
2024-03-14 | House | Executive Session: 03/20/2024 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2024-03-06 | House | Executive Session: 03/13/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2024-02-27 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 03/06/2024 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2024-02-06 | House | Public Hearing: 02/13/2024 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 305 |
2024-02-06 | House | Public Hearing on non-germane Amendment # 2024-0031h: 02/14/2024 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2023-11-28 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration |