NH CACR30 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on February 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-15 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 16, PG.920
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on February 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-15 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 16, PG.920
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to limitations on impeachment judgment. Providing that judgment may include forfeiture of pension and retirement benefits.
Title
Relating to limitations on impeachment judgment. Providing that judgment may include forfeiture of pension and retirement benefits.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-15 | House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 16, PG.920 | |
2012-02-08 | House Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Feb 15 (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 11, PG.686 | |
2012-01-31 | House Executive Session: 2/7/2012 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 | |
2012-01-18 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 1/26/2012 1:32 PM Legislative Office Building 208 | |
2011-12-27 | House Public Hearing: 1/17/2012 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 208 | |
2011-11-28 | House Introduced 1/4/2012 and Referred to Judiciary; House Journal 7, PG.366 |