NE LR289CA | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Constitutional amendment to change and provide legislative district redistricting standards and to provide congressional district redistricting standards
Title
Constitutional amendment to change and provide legislative district redistricting standards and to provide congressional district redistricting standards
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Krist [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2018-01-25 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 01, 2018 |
2018-01-19 | Legislature | Referred to Executive Board |
2018-01-17 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=34718 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LR289CA.pdf |