NE LB595 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for the use of physical force or physical restraint or removal from a class in response to student behavior
Title
Provide for the use of physical force or physical restraint or removal from a class in response to student behavior
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2018-01-03 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2017-04-24 | Legislature | Walz AM1165 filed |
2017-04-24 | Legislature | Chambers AM1158 filed |
2017-04-24 | Legislature | Chambers MO99 pending |
2017-04-24 | Legislature | Chambers MO99 Reconsider the vote to recommit to committee filed |
2017-04-24 | Legislature | Chambers MO98 failed |
2017-04-24 | Legislature | Chambers MO98 pending |
2017-04-24 | Legislature | Chambers MO98 Recommit to Education Committee filed |
2017-04-24 | Legislature | Baker AM797 pending |
2017-04-24 | Legislature | Chambers MO19 withdrawn |
2017-04-24 | Legislature | Education AM581 pending |
2017-04-21 | Legislature | Baker AM1092 filed |
2017-04-21 | Legislature | Baker AM1091 filed |
2017-04-21 | Legislature | Baker AM1090 filed |
2017-04-21 | Legislature | Baker AM1089 filed |
2017-04-21 | Legislature | Baker AM1088 filed |
2017-04-21 | Legislature | Baker AM1087 filed |
2017-04-21 | Legislature | Baker AM1086 filed |
2017-04-21 | Legislature | Baker AM1085 filed |
2017-04-21 | Legislature | Baker AM1084 filed |
2017-03-29 | Legislature | Baker AM797 filed |
2017-03-16 | Legislature | Education AM581 filed |
2017-03-16 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM581 |
2017-03-09 | Legislature | Groene priority bill |
2017-01-30 | Legislature | Chambers motion to reconsider the vote on the motion to overrule the Speaker's Agenda failed |
2017-01-30 | Legislature | Chambers motion to overrule the Speaker's Agenda failed |
2017-01-24 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 07, 2017 |
2017-01-24 | Legislature | Chambers MO19 Rerefer to Judiciary Committee filed |
2017-01-24 | Legislature | Rereferred to Education Committee |
2017-01-20 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2017-01-18 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=31673 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LB595.pdf |