NE LB168 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to rights of subrogation of medical payments with respect to automobile liability policies
Title
Change provisions relating to rights of subrogation of medical payments with respect to automobile liability policies
Sponsors
Sen. Laura Ebke [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2018-01-03 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2017-01-30 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 15, 2017 |
2017-01-24 | Legislature | Rereferred to Judiciary Committee |
2017-01-12 | Legislature | Referred to Banking, Commerce and Insurance Committee |
2017-01-10 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=31481 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LB168.pdf |