NE LB1103 | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to medicaid reimbursements, provide for a lien, and change estate procedures
Title
Change provisions relating to medicaid reimbursements, provide for a lien, and change estate procedures
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2016-04-01 | Legislature | Schumacher MO256 failed |
2016-04-01 | Legislature | Schumacher MO256 Invoke cloture filed |
2016-04-01 | Legislature | Larson MO253 pending |
2016-04-01 | Legislature | Larson MO253 Bracket until April 20, 2016 filed |
2016-04-01 | Legislature | Judiciary AM2394 pending |
2016-04-01 | Legislature | Morfeld MO251 prevailed |
2016-04-01 | Legislature | Morfeld MO251 Reconsider the vote on AM2394 filed |
2016-04-01 | Legislature | Schnoor MO250 pending |
2016-03-31 | Legislature | Schnoor MO250 Indefinitely postpone filed |
2016-03-31 | Legislature | Judiciary AM2394 lost |
2016-03-31 | Legislature | Kuehn MO249 failed |
2016-03-31 | Legislature | Kuehn MO249 Bracket until April 20, 2016 filed |
2016-03-31 | Legislature | Judiciary AM2394 pending |
2016-03-09 | Legislature | Judiciary AM2394 filed |
2016-03-09 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM2394 |
2016-02-18 | Legislature | Schumacher priority bill |
2016-01-27 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 03, 2016 |
2016-01-22 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2016-01-20 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=28685 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/Current/PDF/Intro/LB1103.pdf |