NE LB1015 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allow withholding from public of reports of injury under the Nebraska Workers' Compensation Act that reveal an employee's identity
Title
Allow withholding from public of reports of injury under the Nebraska Workers' Compensation Act that reveal an employee's identity
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Briese [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2018-04-03 | Legislature | Chambers MO316 failed |
2018-04-03 | Legislature | Chambers MO316 Bracket until April 18, 2018 filed |
2018-04-03 | Legislature | Harr AM2590 pending |
2018-04-03 | Legislature | Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM1927 pending |
2018-03-27 | Legislature | Quick AM2589 filed |
2018-03-22 | Legislature | Harr AM2590 filed |
2018-02-28 | Legislature | Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM1927 filed |
2018-02-28 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM1927 |
2018-02-20 | Legislature | Government, Military and Veterans Affairs priority bill |
2018-02-06 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 14, 2018 |
2018-01-18 | Legislature | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2018-01-16 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=34231 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LB1015.pdf |