ND SB2305 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-01 - Signed by Governor 03/28
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-01 - Signed by Governor 03/28
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact subsection 5 of section 53-12.1-01, subdivision a of subsection 2 of section 53-12.1-03, section 53-12.1-08, subsection 1 of section 53-12.1-11, subsections 1 and 7 of section 53-12.1-12, and section 53-12.1-13 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to individuals eligible to play the North Dakota lottery and claim prizes and lottery online play; and to provide a penalty.
Title
Individuals eligible to play the North Dakota lottery and claim prizes and lottery online play; and to provide a penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-25 - House - House Second reading (Y: 81 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-01 | Senate | Signed by Governor 03/28 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-03-27 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Returned to Senate |
2019-03-25 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 81 nays 9 |
2019-03-20 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 10 3 1 |
2019-03-13 | House | Committee Hearing 09:45 |
2019-02-18 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |
2019-01-25 | House | Received from Senate |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |