ND HCR3033 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/03
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/03
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A concurrent resolution requiring the flag of the United States of America to be flown in Memorial Hall at all times in honor of veterans and members of the armed forces.
Title
A concurrent resolution requiring the flag of the United States of America to be flown in Memorial Hall at all times in honor of veterans and members of the armed forces.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-03 | House | Filed with Secretary Of State 04/03 |
2019-04-03 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-03-29 | House | Returned to House |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Second reading, adopted |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-02-20 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on table |
2019-02-20 | House | Second reading, adopted |
2019-02-19 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-02-18 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0 |
2019-02-14 | House | Committee Hearing 08:00 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |