ND HCR3004 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/03
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/03
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A concurrent resolution requesting the Legislative Management to study the potential benefit value of blockchain technology implementation and utilization in state government administration and affairs.
Title
A concurrent resolution requesting the Legislative Management to study the potential benefit value of blockchain technology implementation and utilization in state government administration and affairs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-27 - House - House Second reading, adopted (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-03 | House | Filed with Secretary Of State 04/03 |
2019-04-03 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-03-29 | House | Returned to House |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Second reading, adopted |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-02-27 | House | Second reading, adopted yeas 88 nays 0 |
2019-02-08 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-02-07 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 1 0 |
2019-02-06 | House | Committee Hearing 11:00 |
2019-01-08 | House | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2019-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |