ND HB1279 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Signed by Governor 04/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Signed by Governor 04/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact sections 43-06-03 and 43-06-04 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to membership of the board of chiropractic examiners; and to provide for application.
Title
Membership of the board of chiropractic examiners; and to provide for application.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | House | Signed by Governor 04/10 |
2019-04-05 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-05 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-04-02 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 91 nays 0 |
2019-04-02 | House | Concurred |
2019-03-26 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 45 nays 0 |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Laid over one legislative day |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 5 0 1 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-02-13 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 91 nays 0 |
2019-02-08 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-02-07 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 0 2 |
2019-01-28 | House | Committee Hearing 09:15 |
2019-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |